THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:28:00 AM
Davis, Neil Leonard
CPSO#:
91909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medi, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:23 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
|
Active |