THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:26:46 AM
Myatt, Matthew Francis
CPSO#:
91895
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Crescent
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. |
Mattawa |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW FRANCIS MYATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYATT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
AVP - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2011 |