THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:38:55 PM
Tyan, Chung Chun
CPSO#:
91893
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1) 800 Danforth Rd
Scarborough, ON M1K 1H8
2) 294 Main St
Suite 301
Toronto, ON M4C 4X5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2017 |