THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:58:37 AM
Khalil, Waill Yousry Ibrahim Hassan
CPSO#:
91883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
5-521 Hwy 8
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G4
Phone: 905-662-2775
Fax: 905-662-7775
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:05 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAILL YOUSRY IBRAHIM HASSAN KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2009 to 06 Nov 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2019 |