THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:46:31 AM
Robert, Christopher Eugene
CPSO#:
91879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300G Fourth Ave
Unit 104
First on Fourth Building
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Phone: 905-684-4364
Fax: 905-684-4466
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:11 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EUGENE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2012 |