THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:35:15 AM
Burkett, Andrew Michael
CPSO#:
91873
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
KW Campus
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 6962
Fax: (519) 749-4384
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:22 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW MICHAEL BURKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 15 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |