THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:55:57 PM
Karp, Natalya Sagitovna
CPSO#:
91853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Kazakh State Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Ext. 74996
Fax: 519 685 8214
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALYA SAGITOVNA KARP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2009 to 05 Oct 2009
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |