THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:44:51 PM
Athar, Humera
CPSO#:
91841
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |