THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:50:46 PM
Dada, Oluwatomilola Oluwapelumi
CPSO#:
91830
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Makinde, Oluwatomilola Oluwapelumi (used until: 09 Mar 2020 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
15 Resolution Dr
Brampton ON L6W 0A6
Phone: 2892985474
Fax: 2892985472
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Oluwatomilola Dada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUWATOMILOLA OLUWAPELUMI DADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 09 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2012 |