THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:21:08 PM
Murray, David Andrew
CPSO#:
91824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suites 403-405
147 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 4E9
Phone: 519-763-1914
Fax: 519 836-4447
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2015 |