THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:47:40 PM
Romao, Rodrigo Luiz Pinto
CPSO#:
91804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:01 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:01 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |