THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:55:41 AM
Hays, Luke Ahmed
CPSO#:
91798
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUKE AHMED HAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 07 Jul 2009 to 02 Aug 2009
EL - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |