THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:51:34 AM
Garcia, Andrea Michelle
CPSO#:
91783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of the Republic, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
79 Dundas Street W Suite 104/105
Mississauga ON L5B 1H7
Phone: (905) 275-1309
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA MICHELLE GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2012 |