THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:08:34 AM
Malisic, Dragoljub
CPSO#:
91780
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON M9V 1A5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact the Appletree Medical Group: 900 Albion Road, Etobicoke, ON., M9V 1A5. Telephone: 647-722-2370. Fax: (647) 490-6330
Date Received: 12 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGOLJUB MALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALISIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |