THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:21:42 AM
Crane, Jordan David Thomas
CPSO#:
91775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1199 Chemong Road
Peterborough ON K9J 0G3
Phone: (705) 876-4549
Fax: (705) 740-0996
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Crane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORDAN DAVID THOMAS CRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 01, 2019, Dr. Crane has completed all the requirements of his SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)