THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:09:38 AM
Kanagaratnam, Sivaruban
CPSO#:
91744
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Moscow State University of Medicine & De, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-1921 Saskatchewan Dr
Swift Current SK S9H 5T1
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIVARUBAN KANAGARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANAGARATNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
EL - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
EL - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2023 |