THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:56:16 AM
Figueroa, Luis
CPSO#:
91739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Figueroa Gallaga, Luis Leovigildo (used until: 01 Mar 2015 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
605-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Phone: 416 742 2961
Fax: 4167420076
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUIS FIGUEROA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGUEROA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2009
PEAP - R - Vascular Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |