THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:10:30 AM
Edwards, Wesley John
CPSO#:
91713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tasmania, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 May 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
|
Active |