THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:06:14 AM
Soliman, Sherrin
CPSO#:
91709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-5 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON N2C 2J6
Phone: (519) 896-8008
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Soliman Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERRIN SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |