THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:58:31 AM
Khadim, Hamid
CPSO#:
91674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ahmadzai, Hamid (used until: 06 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Pashto
Education: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMID KHADIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHADIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 02 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 03 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2012 |