THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:52:18 AM
Shanthanna, Harsha
CPSO#:
91661
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 28 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |