THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:53:17 PM
Spano, Frank Anthony
CPSO#:
91615
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
460 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
Phone: 5194910050
Electoral District: 01
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Spano's medical records are being stored at
457 London Road
Sarnia, Ontario
N7T 4W9
Date Received: 25 Jul 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:24 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANK ANTHONY SPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |