THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:09:32 AM
Buyukdere, Hakan
CPSO#:
91612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Istanbul University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
4th Floor Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Moncton Hospital, 135 Macbeath Avenue, Moncton, NB E1C 6Z8
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:26 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAKAN BUYUKDERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUYUKDERE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2017 |