THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:45:35 AM
Kozloff, Nicole Rachel
CPSO#:
91600
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
1025 Queen Street West, B1-4345
Toronto ON M6J 1H1
Phone: 4165358501 Ext. 30769
Fax: 416-260-4197
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE RACHEL KOZLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZLOFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2015 |