THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:47:02 AM
Mouzaki, Marialena
CPSO#:
91582
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek, Spanish
Education: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |