THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:44:48 AM
Ravani, Shirin
CPSO#:
91550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
199-6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2
Phone: 4169162733
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRIN RAVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2021 |