THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:47:32 PM
McCoy, Blathnaid Marie
CPSO#:
91541
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2019 |