THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:50:24 PM
Black, Graham
CPSO#:
91528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRAHAM BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |