THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:45:35 PM
Williams, Lara Judith Alexandra
CPSO#:
91501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
305-737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON K1J 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13963
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Colorectal Surgery |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARA JUDITH ALEXANDRA WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2015 |