THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:23:23 AM
Singam, Thiru
CPSO#:
91498
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
381 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7004
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Apr 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2021 |
|
Active |