THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:40:07 PM
Tessier, Carole Rolande Marie
CPSO#:
91478
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLE ROLANDE MARIE TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2011 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 29 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2014 |