THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:15:08 AM
Kwong, Adrienne Yue-Ann
CPSO#:
91475
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Palliative Care
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE YUE-ANN KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2013 |