THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:15:24 AM
Pasyk, Ewa Anna
CPSO#:
91432
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Fax: (905) 545-6793
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ewa A. Pasyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EWA ANNA PASYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASYK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 16 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2014 |