THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:46:32 PM
Lo, Aaron Ngar-Luen
CPSO#:
91414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 217
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-9054
Fax: (905) 844-5352
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Aaron N. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON NGAR-LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |