THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:45:14 AM
Cases, Margaret Robin Billano
CPSO#:
91408
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
725 Arlington Park Pl
Apex Heart Centre
Unit 2
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Phone: 6135475458
Fax: 6135476406
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET ROBIN BILLANO CASES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2014 |