THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:59:13 AM
Janhunen, David Richard
CPSO#:
91391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
285 MacDougall Street
Thunder Bay ON P7A 2K6
Phone: (807) 345-7364
Fax: (807) 345-0390
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD JANHUNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANHUNEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 20 Oct 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2011 |