THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:34:56 PM
Drakhshan, Afrooz
CPSO#:
91362
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Derakhshan Chaleshtari, Afrooz (used until: 14 Apr 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shahr-E-Kord University of Med Sciences, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
300 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON L4J 1A1
Phone: (905) 597-6100
Fax: (905) 597-6111
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AFROOZ DRAKHSHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKHSHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |