THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:11:35 PM
Zadhoush, Kourosh
CPSO#:
91361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English, Farsi, Persian
Education: Isfahan University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bradford Medical Centre
Unit 7
PO Box 207
157 Holland Street East
Bradford ON L3Z 2A8
Phone: (905) 551-6555
Fax: (905) 551-7655
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOUROSH ZADHOUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADHOUSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |