THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:45:49 PM
Sarbu, Claudia Luminita
CPSO#:
91348
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Eglantine Driveway
Jeanne-Mance Building
Ottawa ON K1A 0H4
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LUMINITA SARBU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARBU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2015 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2021 |