THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:42:28 AM
Ramlogan, Reva Reeshard
CPSO#:
91332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (647) 637-8751
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REVA REESHARD RAMLOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMLOGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2015 |