THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:01:28 AM
Sikdar, Soma
CPSO#:
91330
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calcutta, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
P.O. Box 9056
Kitchener ON N2G1G3
Phone: (519)-749-4300
Fax: (519)-749-4221
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOMA SIKDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKDAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |