THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:50:26 AM
Swett Cosentino, Jossie Mercedes
CPSO#:
91289
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Catholic University of Santiago de Guaya, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21 Sylvan St
Lake of The Woods District Hospital
General Surgery
4th Floor
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: 8074689861 Ext. 5020
Fax: 8074688009
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSSIE MERCEDES SWETT COSENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWETT COSENTINO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2016 |