THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:04:39 AM
Tolami Hemmati, Nasim
CPSO#:
91278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NASIM TOLAMI HEMMATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLAMI HEMMATI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 10 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 10 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2014 |