THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:31:33 PM
Iyengar, Abhinav Mohan
CPSO#:
91265
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:30 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABHINAV MOHAN IYENGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYENGAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2013 |