THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:46:00 PM
Chaudhry, Salman Rafat
CPSO#:
91255
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
55 Frid St
Hamilton ON L8P 4M3
Phone: 9055292259
Fax: 9055292262
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:31 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALMAN RAFAT CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2015 |