THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:59:07 AM
Crawford, Alyson
CPSO#:
91249
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Nevada
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |