THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:30:45 AM
Weldon, Patrick
CPSO#:
91238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1572
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:09 Feb 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK WELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |