THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:30:26 AM
Al-Mohammedi, Faisal Abdulmohsen Hassan
CPSO#:
91228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:31 Jul 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:28 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAISAL ABDULMOHSEN HASSAN AL-MOHAMMEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOHAMMEDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |