THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:06:23 PM
Deshpande, Poorva Pramod
CPSO#:
91224
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Nagpur University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 4185864800 Ext. 7213
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Mar 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:15 Mar 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2018 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |