THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:06:08 AM
Biro, Laurence Steven
CPSO#:
91218
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416)350-5981
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURENCE STEVEN BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |